Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitale da Bologna, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1348AppointedPrior General of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
19 Dec 1362AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
21 Jul 1363AppointedBishop of Chieti, Italy
1373²DiedBishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vitale da Bologna
Bishop Vitale da Bologna O.S.M. (died 1373) Bishop of Chieti

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 481, and Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 May 2021

Quantcast