Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bokyngham

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Apr 1363AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
25 Jun 1363Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
10 Mar 1398DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Bokyngham
Bishop John Bokyngham (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWargrave

  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 306
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 79
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,809

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast