Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bishop

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
21 May 1253SelectedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
25 May 1253ConfirmedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
11 Jan 1254Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
May 1262³DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Bishop
Bishop John Bishop (died May 1262) Bishop of Chichester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 60
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 241
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,571

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast