Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isacco Bindi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Apr 1344AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
10 May 1353AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
15 Jan 1356AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
7 Jul 1358DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Isacco Bindi
Bishop Isacco Bindi O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 111, and Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Aug 2021

Quantcast