Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexandre Bicknor

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Aug 1317AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
25 Aug 1317Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
14 Jul 1349DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Bicknor
Archbishop Alexandre Bicknor (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 229
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 97, Number 8,247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast