Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes (Jan) Belger (z Miśni)

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Apr 1350AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
29 Apr 1350³Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
30 Jul 1355DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes (Jan) Belger (z Miśni)
Bishop Johannes (Jan) Belger (z Miśni) (died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 515
  • b/c2: ATh, 4 Oct 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,879

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast