Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lewis de Beaumont

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Feb 1317AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
26 Feb 1317Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
24 Sep 1333DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Lewis de Beaumont
Bishop Lewis de Beaumont (died ) Bishop of Durham

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWestminster

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 231
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 72
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 289
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,958

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast