Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh of Beaulieu, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Aug 1218AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
24 Feb 1219Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
4 Jun 1223DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hugh of Beaulieu
Bishop Hugh of Beaulieu O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

EventPlace
Ordained BishopYork, Archdiocese of York, England

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 55
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 231
  • cist: CB, 14 Mar 2016
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,805

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast