Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomeo

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jul 1312AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
8 Jul 1317AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
11 Jan 1328AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
1330²DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo
Archbishop Bartolomeo (died 1330) Archbishop of Manfredonia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 491, and Page 453
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 May 2021

Quantcast