Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido da Baisio

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1312AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
11 Oct 1329AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
29 Feb 1332AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
21 Apr 1349DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guido da Baisio
Bishop Guido da Baisio (died ) Bishop of Ferrara

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 417, and Page 107
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Jun 2021

Quantcast