Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bertrando d’Alagno

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1390AppointedBishop of Famagusta, Cyprus
4 Jan 1391AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
14 Apr 1401AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
18 Jun 1408DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bertrando d’Alagno
Archbishop Bertrando d’Alagno (died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 244, and Page 242
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Aug 2021

Quantcast