Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hieronymus Otto Agricola

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹Born
5 Mar 162550.1SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
2 May 162550.3ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
24 Jun 162550.4Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
6 Mar 162752.1DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hieronymus Otto Agricola
Bishop Hieronymus Otto Agricola (born 1575, died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDilingano

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 121
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1625, Number 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,944

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast