Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Álvaro de Abreu

Deceased

Bishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1419AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
25 May 1421AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
11 Feb 1429AppointedBishop of Évora, Portugal
1440²DiedBishop of Évora, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Álvaro de Abreu
Bishop Álvaro de Abreu (died 1440) Bishop of Évora

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 452, and Page 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 291
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jun 2021

Quantcast