Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Yanji [Yenki]

Dioecesis Ienchivensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Yanji, Jilin, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Yenki [Yanji]
19 July 1928ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Yenki [Yanji] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Yenki [Yanji]
13 April 1937ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Yenki [Yanji] Vicariate Apostolic of Yenki [Yanji]
Diocese of Yanji [Yenki]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Yenki [Yanji] Diocese of Yanji [Yenki]

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 25 Aug 2012