Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Raymund Alfons Ackermann, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Yanji [Yenki], China

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1898Born
3 Oct 192325.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Mar 192527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1950²51.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yanji [Yenki], China
1954²55.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Yanji [Yenki], China
22 Jul 198385.3DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Yanji [Yenki], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raymund Alfons Ackermann
Father Raymund Alfons Ackermann O.S.B. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Yanji [Yenki]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKirchschönbach, Diocese of Würzburg, Germany
Death PlaceMünsterschwarzach, Abbey, Schwarzach am Main

  • a priest for 58.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 27 Dec 2019

Quantcast