Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Timotheus (Franz Xaver) Bitterli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Tŏkwon {Tokugen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1905BornRohr, Switzerland
11 Oct 192823.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Mar 193226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 May 195247.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tŏkwon {Tokugen}, Korea (North)
9 Apr 195448.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yanji [Yenki], China
10 Mar 196256.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hamhŭng, Korea (North)
22 May 198176.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Hamhŭng, Korea (North)
4 Oct 198580.4RetiredApostolic Administrator of Tŏkwon {Tokugen}, Korea (North)
4 Oct 198580.4RetiredApostolic Administrator of Yanji [Yenki], China
7 Jun 199085.1DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Tŏkwon {Tokugen}, Korea (North)

MicroData Summary for Timotheus (Franz Xaver) Bitterli:
Priest Timotheus (Franz Xaver) Bitterli O.S.B. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Tŏkwon {Tokugen}

  • a priest for 58.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013