Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace Siméon Zora

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1754¹BornMossul
1780¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest
1804¹50.0Converted
1810²56.0AppointedBishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria
10 Jun 181056.4Ordained BishopBishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria
2 Jan 181460.0SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
2 Jan 181460.0SelectedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
8 Mar 181662.2ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
8 Mar 181662.2ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
1 Jun 181864.4ResignedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
1 Jun 181864.4ResignedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
21 Aug 183884.6DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignace Siméon Zora:
Patriarch Ignace Siméon Zora (died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 80
  • b: CB, 1 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013