Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Wojna

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569²Born
25 May 161142.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
25 May 161142.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
18 Mar 161344.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
20 Jul 162657.5AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
24 Mar 163162.2AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
14 Apr 164980.2DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Abraham Wojna
Bishop Abraham Wojna (born 1569, died ) Bishop of Vilnius

  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,931
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 240, and Page 304
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 370
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast