Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lelio Ruini

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Sep 1612AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
22 Oct 1612AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
17 Mar 1613Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
Sep 1614³ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
31 Dec 1621DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lelio Ruini (VIAF: 204973148)
Bishop Lelio Ruini (died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 108
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1613, Number 7
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016