Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Burkhard Cardinal Weisbriach (Wei▀priach)

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1421¹Born
5 Mar 146039.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 Nov 146140.9SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
23 Jan 146241.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
9 May 146241.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
31 May 146241.4Elevated to Cardinal
31 May 146241.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
16 Feb 146645.1DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Burkhard Weisbriach (Wei▀priach):
Cardinal Burkhard Weisbriach (Wei▀priach) (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
  • a cardinal for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 228
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,616
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Mar 1460

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013