Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich von Plankenfels

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Oct 1453AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
23 Dec 1453Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
28 Feb 1467DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ulrich von Plankenfels
Bishop Ulrich von Plankenfels (died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1453, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast