Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Villemontée

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1598BornParis
20 May 165758.5SelectedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
1660¹61.1ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
29 Jun 166061.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
19 Oct 167071.9DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Villemontée:
Bishop François de Villemontée (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 227
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015