Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Villa

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1632³Born
29 Nov 168856.1AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
20 Nov 168957.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
Jun 1700³67.6DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Villa
Bishop Michele Villa (born , died Jun 1700) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Ordained BishopSan Pietro in Vincoli, Church, Ittiri, Archdiocese of Sassari
Death PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 82
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: AT, 13 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jan 2017