Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Morillo Velarde

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652¹Born
30 Aug 168432.6SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
15 Jan 168533.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
7 Mar 168533.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
7 Mar 169947.1DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Morillo Velarde
Archbishop Juan Morillo Velarde (born 1652, died ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiruela, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Death PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Sassari, Archdiocese of Sassari

  • a bishop for 14.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 395
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 226, Number 1,405
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 17
  • ob: AT, 13 Jan 2017
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017