Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Sampero

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹Born
1 Oct 168562.7AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
2 Oct 168764.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
May 1688³65.3DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Sampero
Bishop Francesco Sampero (born 1623, died May 1688) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Ordained BishopGes¨ e Maria, Church, Sassari, Archdiocese of Sassari

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 82
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1686, Number 32
  • ob/c2: AT, 13 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jan 2017