Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Natale Bencesi (da Venezia), O. Carm †

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Feb 1436AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
18 Mar 1436Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
1461¹DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Natale Bencesi (da Venezia)
Bishop Natale Bencesi (da Venezia) O. Carm (died 1461) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

  • a bishop for 24.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 204
  • ln/ob: CB, 31 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Aug 2020

Quantcast