Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Pollart

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1447AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
27 Aug 1447Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
1451¹DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Pollart
Bishop Thomas Pollart (died 1451) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Popolo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 147
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,267
  • c2+: CB, 31 Jul 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast