Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Carrara

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tricarico, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Oct 1412AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
29 Oct 1427AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
1432²ResignedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
10 Aug 1448¹DiedBishop Emeritus of Tricarico, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Carrara
Bishop Stefano Carrara (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tricarico

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 224, and Page 255
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 497, and Page 95
  • r/~r223: CB, 30 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Aug 2020

Quantcast