Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Deys (Theis von Thesingen)

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1365Born
16 Apr 142257.2AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
142358.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
Apr 142459.2AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
7 May 142964.3DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Deys (Theis von Thesingen) (VIAF: 107738076)
Bishop Friedrich Deys (Theis von Thesingen) (born 1365, died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWünnenberg

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 184, and Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018