Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Markus Tegginger (Tettinger)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Basel, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Lydda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540²Born
1561¹21.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 156828.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
10 Dec 156828.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
21 Dec 156828.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
1599²59.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
20 Feb 160060.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Markus Tegginger (Tettinger) (VIAF: 171767360)
Bishop Markus Tegginger (Tettinger) (born 1540, died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadolfzell
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceFreiburg

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 225
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 14, Number 45
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1568, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018