Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Christoph Blarer von Wartensee

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1542Born
4 May 157633.9AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
10 Feb 157734.7Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
18 Apr 160865.9DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jakob Christoph Blarer von Wartensee (VIAF: 40256740)
Bishop Jakob Christoph Blarer von Wartensee (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChateau, Wartensee
Ordained BishopS. Marcel, Delemont

  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 130
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1577, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018