Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Chisholm

Deceased

Former Administrator of Vaison, France


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1561AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dunblane, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Jun 1561AppointedTitular Bishop of Massilitan
1564²SucceededBishop of Dunblane, Scotland, Great Britain
1569¹ResignedBishop of Dunblane, Scotland, Great Britain
8 Nov 1570AppointedAdministrator of Vaison, France
1585¹ResignedAdministrator of Vaison, France
26 Sep 1593DiedFormer Administrator of Vaison, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Chisholm
Bishop William Chisholm (died ) Former Administrator of Vaison

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327, and Page 188
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 238
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018