Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Dzedziński (Szezniski)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Aenos


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1568AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
3 Dec 1568AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenos
21 Dec 1568Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aenos
1573¹DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Dzedziński (Szezniski)
Bishop Stanisław Dzedziński (Szezniski) (died 1573) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 96
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 14, Number 45
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 19
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Apr 2019

Quantcast