Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerome Strasser, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gurk

Titular Bishop of Temnus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1574BornPassau
7 Feb 162853.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gurk, Austria
7 Feb 162853.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Temnus
16 Jul 162853.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temnus
17 Sep 164166.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Jerome Strasser:
Bishop Jerome Strasser O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gurk

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 330
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015