Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco do Soveral, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angola e Congo


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Oct 1623AppointedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
Apr 1624³Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
8 Feb 1627AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
5 Jan 1642DiedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco do Soveral:
Bishop Francisco do Soveral O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Angola e Congo

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,782
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013