Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Martins Mascarenhas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554¹Born
22 Aug 159440.6AppointedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
5 Feb 159541.0Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
4 Jul 161662.5ResignedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
20 Jan 162874.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Martins Mascarenhas (VIAF: 20021450)
Bishop Fernando Martins Mascarenhas (born 1554, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Faro {Algarve}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 278
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018