Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Saint Néctaire, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1561AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
23 May 1563Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
Nov 1592³DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Saint Néctaire
Bishop Antoine de Saint Néctaire O.S.B. (died Nov 1592) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Death PlaceLe Monastier

  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 110
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,563, Number 5
  • c2: CB, 28 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast