Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Jan Jacek Śladkowski, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland

Titular Bishop of Citrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹Born
1612¹31.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 May 162241.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
2 May 162241.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Citrus
1 Nov 164362.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Abraham Jan Jacek Śladkowski (VIAF: 249801106)
Bishop Abraham Jan Jacek Śladkowski O.P. (born 1581, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChelm

  • a priest for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 151
  • b: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 56
  • b/c2: CB, 29 Mar 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,874
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 22 Nov 2019

Quantcast