Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Sennyey

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornKüküllővár
25 Apr 161626.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 162131.8SelectedBishop of Bosnia, Croatia
5 May 162333.3SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
27 Jan 162737.1ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
18 Jul 162737.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
11 Jul 162838.5AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
24 Mar 163040.2AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
22 Oct 163545.8DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for István Sennyey:
Bishop István Sennyey (died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 19.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 119, and Page 207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 356, and Page 366
  • ob/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013