Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann von Schönenberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1525¹Born
31 Jul 158156.5SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
26 Jan 158257.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
12 Aug 158257.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
1 May 159974.3DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann von Schönenberg (VIAF: 88905986)
Archbishop Johann von Schönenberg (born 1525, died ) Archbishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHartelstein
Ordained BishopAugsburg, Diocese of Augsburg

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 317
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast