Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ludovico Cardinal Madruzzo

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532¹Born
30 May 155018.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trento, Italy
26 Feb 156129.1Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jun 156129.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Callisto
4 May 156230.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Onofrio
1564²32.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 156735.8SucceededBishop of Trento, Italy
9 Feb 156937.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
18 Jun 157038.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
1 Oct 158654.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
20 Mar 159159.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
18 Aug 159765.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
21 Feb 160068.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
20 Apr 160068.3DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Madruzzo (VIAF: 72195232)
Ludovico Cardinal Madruzzo (born 1532, died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento
Ordained BishopS. Onofrio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Madruzzo Chapel, S. Onofrio al Gianicolo, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
  • a cardinal for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 39, and Page 318
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 17, Number 61
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1570, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018