Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Jean Sahhar

Deceased

Bishop of Aqrā {Akra} (Chaldean), Iraq

Bishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1853Born
2 May 188633.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 189037.7AppointedBishop of Aqrā {Akra} (Chaldean), Iraq
25 Mar 189340.0Ordained BishopBishop of Aqrā {Akra} (Chaldean), Iraq
29 Apr 189542.1AppointedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
13 Jun 190956.2DiedBishop of Aqrā {Akra} (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Jean Sahhar
Bishop Jacques-Jean Sahhar (born , died ) Bishop of Aqrā {Akra}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul
Ordained BishopMossul

  • a priest for 23.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,353
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 83, and Page 92
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018