Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Rabbani

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian)

Titular Archbishop of Nacolia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1889BornMossul
11 May 191323.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 192737.7SelectedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
19 Dec 192738.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
29 Jan 192838.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
14 Dec 194758.3ResignedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
14 Dec 194758.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Constantina
24 Feb 195161.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nacolia
2 May 197383.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Rabbani:
Archbishop Joseph Rabbani (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Homs (-Hama-Nabk)

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1971
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015