Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Potentia, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Amalfi

Titular Bishop of Tiberias


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jun 1589AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Amalfi, Italy
12 Jun 1589AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
18 Jun 1589Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
1592¹DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Amalfi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Potentia
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Potentia O.F.M. Conv. (died 1592) Coadjutor Archbishop of Amalfi

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 106
  • ob/c2: AT, 10 Jul 2016
  • ob: CB, 21 Jul 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,964

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Sep 2016