Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Pilotti, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China

Titular Bishop of Porthmus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1699Born
171515.7ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
2 Oct 173940.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
2 Oct 173940.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Porthmus
22 Jan 174141.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porthmus
7 Dec 174243.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
30 Dec 175657.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Pilotti
Bishop Eugenio Pilotti O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBassano
Ordained BishopKo-kia-kow
Death PlaceKiangchow

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 345, and Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 3
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast