Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Antoine Buocher, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chansi and Chensi, China

Titular Bishop of Rosalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1701Born
21 Jan 175250.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
21 Jan 175250.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
16 Dec 175352.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosalia
30 Dec 175655.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
176058.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
5 Nov 176564.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chansi and Chensi, China

MicroData Summary for Jean-Antoine Buocher
Bishop Jean-Antoine Buocher O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chansi and Chensi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto Ferraio
Ordained BishopKian Leu, Vicariate Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi
Death PlaceMacau, Diocese of Macau

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 358, and Page 455
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,987

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast