Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Petrucci

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornSienne
1607¹27.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 162040.8AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
30 Nov 162040.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi, Italy
Mar 163353.1DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Petrucci:
Bishop Alfonso Petrucci , Bishop of Chiusi

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015