Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placido Pavanello, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1454AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
24 Jan 1457AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
5 Nov 1464AppointedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
1471²DiedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Placido Pavanello
Bishop Placido Pavanello O.S.B. (died 1471) Bishop of Torcello (Turris)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 253, and Page 212
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 105
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1454, Number 1*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast