Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Maffeo Cardinal Gherardi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1406²BornVenice
Apr 1466³60.3SelectedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
16 Dec 146863.0ConfirmedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
9 Apr 146963.3Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
9 Mar 148983.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
3 Aug 149286.6Elevated to Cardinal
14 Sep 149286.7DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maffeo Gherardi:
Maffeo Cardinal Gherardi O.S.B. (died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
  • a cardinal for 3.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1489
  • ob: CB, 8 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014