Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Étienne de Poissy

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Dec 1363AppointedBishop of Paris, France
3 Mar 1364Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
22 Sep 1368AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
22 Sep 1368Elevated to Cardinal
16 Oct 1373DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

MicroData Summary for Étienne de Poissy
Bishop Étienne de Poissy (died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
  • a cardinal for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 391
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,921
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jun 2020

Quantcast